Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0128
Title
Prince George’s County – Utility Services – Master Meters and Task Force PG 429–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680 (SB0021)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB1209)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491 /CH0532
Title
Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 (HB0680)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1209 (HB1158)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0218 /CH0128 Prince George’s County – Utility Services – Master Meters and Task Force PG 429–18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Economic Matters
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0680 (SB0021) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1158 (SB1209) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1491 /CH0532 Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0021 (HB0680) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1209 (HB1158) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM