Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Copyright

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0622)
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0066 (SB0342/CH0065)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0666)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1569 (SB0684)
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 /CH0065 (HB0837/CH0066)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 (HB0471)
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0982)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB1569)
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807
Title
Higher Education - Ethics and Procurement Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0471 (SB0622) Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 /CH0066 (SB0342/CH0065) State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts Delegate Haynes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0982 (SB0666) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1569 (SB0684) Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0342 /CH0065 (HB0837/CH0066) State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement Contracts Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 (HB0471) Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 (HB0982) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0684 (HB1569) Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 Higher Education - Ethics and Procurement Requirements Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM