Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Copyright

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 (SB0518)
Title
Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 (SB1005)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1466
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Contracts - Intellectual Property
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1656
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0533)
Title
Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB0957)
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0305 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 (SB0518) Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0957 (SB1005) Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020 Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1466 Labor and Employment - Employment Contracts - Intellectual Property Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1547 Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Producer Responsibility Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1656 Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0518 (HB0533) Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Finance)
Finance
Budget and Taxation
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 (HB0957) Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:19 AM