Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Correction, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0829
Title
Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0687
Title
Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 (SB0921)
Title
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Employees - Job Titles, Position Descriptions, and Compensation Levels
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 (HB1161)
Title
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1119
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0232 /CH0829 Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 /CH0687 Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0881 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 (SB0921) State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0772 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Employees - Job Titles, Position Descriptions, and Compensation Levels Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0921 (HB1161) State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1119 Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM