Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Correction, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 (SB0527/CH0524)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 (SB0621)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0821/CH0060)
Title
Correctional Services – Prerelease Study and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0419)
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Requirement to Operate
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0745 (SB0809/CH0324)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Release (Suzanne Jones Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947
Title
Correctional Services - Female Inmate Serving Life Term - Transitional Work Release Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0730)
Title
State Personnel – Merit Pay
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0715)
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Requirement to Operate
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 /CH0524 (HB0078)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575
Title
Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604
Title
Correctional Services - Elderly Inmates - Compassionate Release
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 (HB0294)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1240)
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0060 (HB0710)
Title
Correctional Services – Prerelease Study and Report
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855
Title
Correctional Services - Medical Cannabis - Medical Treatment for Inmates
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 (SB0527/CH0524) Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0294 (SB0621) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 (SB0821/CH0060) Correctional Services – Prerelease Study and Report Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0715 (SB0419) Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Requirement to Operate Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0745 (SB0809/CH0324) Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0928 Correctional Services - Inmate Release (Suzanne Jones Act) Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 Correctional Services - Female Inmate Serving Life Term - Transitional Work Release Program Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1002 Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1032 Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1240 (SB0730) State Personnel – Merit Pay Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0419 (HB0715) Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Requirement to Operate Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0527 /CH0524 (HB0078) Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0575 Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0604 Correctional Services - Elderly Inmates - Compassionate Release Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0621 (HB0294) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB1240) State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 /CH0060 (HB0710) Correctional Services – Prerelease Study and Report Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 Correctional Services - Medical Cannabis - Medical Treatment for Inmates Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM