Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Correction, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608 (SB0682)
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Requirement to Operate
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Minimum Age Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0999)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 (SB0684)
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 (SB0922)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0828 (SB0683)
Title
Corrections - Women's Prerelease Unit - Requirements (Women's Prerelease Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Release (Suzanne Jones Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Correctional Services - Home County Correctional Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411
Title
Correctional Services – Transfers to Federal Authorities – Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders from Violent Crime Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1528 (SB0716)
Title
Maryland Council on Health in All Policies - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1553 (SB0077)
Title
Identification Cards and Driver's License Renewals - Inmates
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1566
Title
Maryland Correctional Enterprises - Workgroup on Vocational Training and Placement
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1608
Title
Division of Correction - Appointment and Removal of Employees - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 (HB1553)
Title
Important Documents and Identification Cards – Inmates
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682 (HB0608)
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Requirement to Operate
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0828)
Title
Corrections - Women's Prerelease Unit - Requirements (Women's Prerelease Equity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0801)
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 (HB1528)
Title
Maryland Council on Health in All Policies - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 (HB0812)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Milestones
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 (HB0740)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0608 (SB0682) Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Requirement to Operate Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Minimum Age Requirement Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0740 (SB0999) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 (SB0684) Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act) Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0812 (SB0922) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Clippinger)
Judiciary
HB0828 (SB0683) Corrections - Women's Prerelease Unit - Requirements (Women's Prerelease Equity Act) Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 Correctional Services - Inmate Release (Suzanne Jones Act) Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1368 Correctional Services - Home County Correctional Facility Program Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1411 Correctional Services – Transfers to Federal Authorities – Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders from Violent Crime Act of 2020) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1528 (SB0716) Maryland Council on Health in All Policies - Establishment Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1553 (SB0077) Identification Cards and Driver's License Renewals - Inmates Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1566 Maryland Correctional Enterprises - Workgroup on Vocational Training and Placement Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1608 Division of Correction - Appointment and Removal of Employees - Standards Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0035 Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0077 (HB1553) Important Documents and Identification Cards – Inmates Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0682 (HB0608) Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Requirement to Operate Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0828) Corrections - Women's Prerelease Unit - Requirements (Women's Prerelease Equity Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0684 (HB0801) Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0716 (HB1528) Maryland Council on Health in All Policies - Establishment Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0922 (HB0812) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0971 Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Milestones Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0999 (HB0740) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Direct Release Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:01 PM