Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0414)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0602/CH0042)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0250 (SB0207)
Title
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Court and Police Records - Acquittal, Dismissal, or Nolle Prosequi
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 /CH0123
Title
Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Name Change
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 (HB0472/CH0250)
Title
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0301)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Incapacity
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 /CH0042 (HB0388)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0301 (SB0414) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0388 (SB0602/CH0042) Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council Delegate Dumais 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0250 (SB0207) Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory Requirements Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Economic Matters
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0904 Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Court and Police Records - Acquittal, Dismissal, or Nolle Prosequi Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1244 /CH0123 Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Name Change Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 (HB0472/CH0250) Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 (HB0301) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Incapacity Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0602 /CH0042 (HB0388) Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM