Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582 (SB0473/CH0211)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092 /CH0297 (SB0999)
Title
St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 /CH0597 (SB0946/CH0596)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional Education
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
State and Local Correctional Facilities - Release - Notification of Immigration Status
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298
Title
Baltimore County - Release From Local Correctional Facilities - Notification of Immigration Status
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1601
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0211 (HB0582)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances
Sponsor
Senator Peters
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590
Title
Correctional Services - Solitary Confinement - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783
Title
Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 /CH0596 (HB1180/CH0597)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 (HB1092/CH0297)
Title
St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0582 (SB0473/CH0211) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0757 Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1092 /CH0297 (SB0999) St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1126 Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1180 /CH0597 (SB0946/CH0596) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1195 Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional Education Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 State and Local Correctional Facilities - Release - Notification of Immigration Status Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 Baltimore County - Release From Local Correctional Facilities - Notification of Immigration Status Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1305 Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1580 Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1601 Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0211 (HB0582) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances Senator Peters 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 Correctional Services - Solitary Confinement - Restrictions Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0783 Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0946 /CH0596 (HB1180/CH0597) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0999 (HB1092/CH0297) St. Mary's County - Keeper of the Jail - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM