Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0687
Title
Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0121 (SB0372/CH0122)
Title
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001 (SB1015)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB1105)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Proximity
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233 (SB0984)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 (SB0981)
Title
Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 /CH0571 (SB0967/CH0572)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Correctional Officer - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0122 (HB0565/CH0121)
Title
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830
Title
Correctional Facilities - Individual Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security Notification
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 /CH0572 (HB1329/CH0571)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984 (HB1233)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1015 (HB1001)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1105 (HB1229)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Proximity
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0459 /CH0687 Higher Education - Adult Correctional Institutions - Job Training and Education Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0565 /CH0121 (SB0372/CH0122) Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1001 (SB1015) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 (SB1105) Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Proximity Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1233 (SB0984) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 (SB0981) Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1329 /CH0571 (SB0967/CH0572) Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017 Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1342 Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Correctional Officer - Reports Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0122 (HB0565/CH0121) Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 Correctional Facilities - Individual Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security Notification Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 /CH0572 (HB1329/CH0571) Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017 Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0984 (HB1233) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB1015 (HB1001) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1105 (HB1229) Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Proximity Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM