Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Corrective Legislation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733 /CH0136
Title
Local Government - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0043
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0733 /CH0136 Local Government - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 /CH0043 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page