Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corrective Legislation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 /CH0045
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0184 /CH0045 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM