Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corrective Legislation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 /CH0008
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0009
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 /CH0228
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0506 /CH0008 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 /CH0009 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 /CH0228 Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and Corrections President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM