Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corrective Legislation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0665
Title
Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 /CH0666
Title
Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical Correction
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0411
Title
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0043
Title
Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 /CH0012
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0054 /CH0665 Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 /CH0666 Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical Correction Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0411 State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 /CH0043 Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 /CH0012 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM