Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cosmetologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 (SB0548)
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists - Criminal Penalties for Practicing Barbering or Cosmetology Without License - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 /CH0492
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists - Mobile Barbershops and Beauty Salons - Permit Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 (SB0679/CH0574)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843 /CH0127 (SB0695)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 /CH0435 (SB0830/CH0434)
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Limited License - Hair Services - Blow Drying
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB0293)
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists - Criminal Penalties for Practicing Barbering or Cosmetology Without License - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Pets on Premises of Beauty Salons - Authorized
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 /CH0574 (HB0700)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0843/CH0127)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 /CH0434 (HB1291/CH0435)
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Limited License - Hair Services - Blow Drying
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0293 (SB0548) Barbers and Cosmetologists - Criminal Penalties for Practicing Barbering or Cosmetology Without License - Repeal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 /CH0492 Barbers and Cosmetologists - Mobile Barbershops and Beauty Salons - Permit Requirement Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Economic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0700 (SB0679/CH0574) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 /CH0127 (SB0695) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1291 /CH0435 (SB0830/CH0434) State Board of Cosmetologists - Limited License - Hair Services - Blow Drying Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0548 (HB0293) Barbers and Cosmetologists - Criminal Penalties for Practicing Barbering or Cosmetology Without License - Repeal Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0678 State Board of Cosmetologists - Pets on Premises of Beauty Salons - Authorized Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 /CH0574 (HB0700) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0695 (HB0843/CH0127) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0830 /CH0434 (HB1291/CH0435) State Board of Cosmetologists - Limited License - Hair Services - Blow Drying Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM