Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cosmetologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 /CH0659 (SB0428/CH0660)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License
Sponsor
Queen Anne's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952 /CH0201 (SB0440)
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203 (SB0564)
Title
Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 /CH0660 (HB0476/CH0659)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0440 (HB0952/CH0201)
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0564 (HB1203)
Title
Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0476 /CH0659 (SB0428/CH0660) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License Queen Anne's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0952 /CH0201 (SB0440) State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1203 (SB0564) Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 /CH0660 (HB0476/CH0659) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0440 (HB0952/CH0201) State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension President 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0564 (HB1203) Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM