Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cosmetologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0361/CH0551)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 /CH0551 (HB0642)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0642 (SB0361/CH0551) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 /CH0551 (HB0642) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 551
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:23 PM