Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Counselors -see also- Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468 (SB0097/CH0348)
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0858)
Title
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0283/CH0546)
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908
Title
Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Training Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016 /CH0519
Title
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
School Counseling Program - Counseling Services - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 /CH0033 (SB1170)
Title
Next Generation Scholars of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437
Title
Education - Individualized Counseling Services - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Department of Human Resources - Housing Counselor and Aftercare Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0348 (HB0468)
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 /CH0546 (HB0583)
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 (HB0579)
Title
Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1026
Title
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1170 (HB1403/CH0033)
Title
Next Generation Scholars of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0468 (SB0097/CH0348) Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0579 (SB0858) Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0583 (SB0283/CH0546) Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0746 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0921 Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Training Requirement Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1016 /CH0519 Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1100 School Counseling Program - Counseling Services - Requirements Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1403 /CH0033 (SB1170) Next Generation Scholars of Maryland Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1437 Education - Individualized Counseling Services - Requirements Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1467 Department of Human Resources - Housing Counselor and Aftercare Program Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0348 (HB0468) Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0283 /CH0546 (HB0583) Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 (HB0579) Mental Health - Wraparound Services for Children and Youth Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1026 Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations President 6 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1170 (HB1403/CH0033) Next Generation Scholars of Maryland Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM