Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Country Clubs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0459/CH0504)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License MC 20-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1248
Title
Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0504 (HB0269)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0522
Title
Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0269 (SB0459/CH0504) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License MC 20-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1248 Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0459 /CH0504 (HB0269) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0552 /CH0522 Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM