Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Country Clubs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 /CH0119
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Club Off-Sale Permit MC 10-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900 /CH0134
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Clubs, Firehouses, and Multiple Event Licenses
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Property Tax - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0144 /CH0119 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Club Off-Sale Permit MC 10-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0176 Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0900 /CH0134 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Clubs, Firehouses, and Multiple Event Licenses Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1340 Property Tax - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM