Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

County and Baltimore City Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194 (SB0270)
Title
Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288 /CH0096
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 (SB0369/CH0045)
Title
Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 (SB0508/CH0060)
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802 (SB0458/CH0056)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846 (SB0588/CH0063)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0194)
Title
Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 /CH0045 (HB0452)
Title
Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458 /CH0056 (HB0802)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0060 (HB0546)
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 /CH0063 (HB0846)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0194 (SB0270) Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0288 /CH0096 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0452 (SB0369/CH0045) Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0546 (SB0508/CH0060) Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds Washington County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0802 (SB0458/CH0056) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 (SB0588/CH0063) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0194) Baltimore City - School Facilities - Funding Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB0369 /CH0045 (HB0452) Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 /CH0056 (HB0802) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 /CH0060 (HB0546) Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 /CH0063 (HB0846) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page