Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County and Baltimore City Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0084 (SB0663)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 /CH0248
Title
Howard County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements Ho. Co. 8-15
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0362/CH0027)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 (SB0913/CH0209)
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0228)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 (HB1193)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0027 (HB0902)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB0296/CH0084)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 /CH0209 (HB1162)
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0296 /CH0084 (SB0663) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0440 /CH0248 Howard County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements Ho. Co. 8-15 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0902 (SB0362/CH0027) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 (SB0913/CH0209) Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1193 (SB0228) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 (HB1193) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 /CH0027 (HB0902) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 (HB0296/CH0084) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 /CH0209 (HB1162) Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM