Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

County and Baltimore City Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 /CH0254 (SB0296)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 /CH0284 (SB0997)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission Bonds - Extension of Maximum Maturity Date
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296 (HB0205/CH0254)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0182
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0997 (HB0889/CH0284)
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission Bonds - Extension of Maximum Maturity Date
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0205 /CH0254 (SB0296) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0889 /CH0284 (SB0997) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission Bonds - Extension of Maximum Maturity Date St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1155 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0296 (HB0205/CH0254) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 /CH0182 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0997 (HB0889/CH0284) St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission Bonds - Extension of Maximum Maturity Date Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page