Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County and Baltimore City Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 /CH0180
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359 /CH0181
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0376/CH0184)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 /CH0096
Title
Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0731)
Title
Build to Learn Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 /CH0184 (HB0574)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0358 /CH0180 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0359 /CH0181 St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 (SB0376/CH0184) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 /CH0096 Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 (SB0731) Build to Learn Act of 2019 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 /CH0184 (HB0574) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM