Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Commissioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0168 (SB0135/CH0167)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 /CH0261
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 /CH0719 (SB0073)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 /CH0363 (SB0227/CH0362)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867 (SB0517/CH0217)
Title
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 /CH0071 (SB0516/CH0070)
Title
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0283 (SB1001)
Title
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1028 /CH0227 (SB0682/CH0226)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147 /CH0301
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education Members - Term Limitation and Referendum
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1344 /CH0509
Title
Queen Anne's County - County Commissioners Election Method - Straw Ballot
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 /CH0167 (HB0149/CH0168)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 /CH0362 (HB0790/CH0363)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0182
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0070 (HB0868/CH0071)
Title
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 /CH0217 (HB0867)
Title
Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682 /CH0226 (HB1028/CH0227)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 /CH0236 (HB0972)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 (HB0884/CH0283)
Title
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 /CH0168 (SB0135/CH0167) Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0352 /CH0261 Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0360 /CH0719 (SB0073) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care Recipients Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 /CH0363 (SB0227/CH0362) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans Delegate Wivell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0867 (SB0517/CH0217) Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process Washington County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 /CH0071 (SB0516/CH0070) Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0884 /CH0283 (SB1001) St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 (SB0995/CH0236) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1028 /CH0227 (SB0682/CH0226) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1147 /CH0301 Carroll County - Board of Education Members - Term Limitation and Referendum Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1344 /CH0509 Queen Anne's County - County Commissioners Election Method - Straw Ballot Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 /CH0167 (HB0149/CH0168) Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0227 /CH0362 (HB0790/CH0363) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 /CH0182 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0516 /CH0070 (HB0868/CH0071) Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 /CH0217 (HB0867) Washington County - Contributions to Nonprofit Organizations - Process Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0682 /CH0226 (HB1028/CH0227) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0995 /CH0236 (HB0972) St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1001 (HB0884/CH0283) St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM