Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Commissioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 /CH0741
Title
St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0807 (SB0173/CH0808)
Title
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 /CH0109
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 /CH0112
Title
Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725
Title
Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing Threshold
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 /CH0114
Title
Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted Budget
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0744
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 /CH0268 (SB0542/CH0269)
Title
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315
Title
Carroll County - County Commissioners - Allowance and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321 /CH0099 (SB0889)
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357 /CH0841
Title
Calvert County - County Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459 /CH0118
Title
Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484
Title
Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo License
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1757 (SB1124)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 /CH0808 (HB0225/CH0807)
Title
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 /CH0699
Title
Garrett County - Bids and Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 /CH0269 (HB0984/CH0268)
Title
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB1321/CH0099)
Title
Washington County – Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0961 /CH0420
Title
Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1124 (HB1757)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0110 /CH0741 St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0225 /CH0807 (SB0173/CH0808) Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0331 /CH0109 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 /CH0112 Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0725 Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing Threshold Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0729 /CH0114 Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted Budget Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 /CH0744 Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0984 /CH0268 (SB0542/CH0269) Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1315 Carroll County - County Commissioners - Allowance and Benefits Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1321 /CH0099 (SB0889) Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds Delegate Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1357 /CH0841 Calvert County - County Officials - Salaries Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1459 /CH0118 Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1484 Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo License Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1580 Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1757 (SB1124) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0173 /CH0808 (HB0225/CH0807) Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0540 /CH0699 Garrett County - Bids and Contracts Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 699
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0542 /CH0269 (HB0984/CH0268) Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0889 (HB1321/CH0099) Washington County – Public Facilities Bonds Washington County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0961 /CH0420 Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1124 (HB1757) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM