Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County Commissioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0047
Title
St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 /CH0596 (SB0261)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 /CH0191 (SB0805/CH0192)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610 (SB0995)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783 (SB0343/CH0326)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 (SB0955)
Title
Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 /CH0480
Title
Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1653
Title
Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0097/CH0596)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0326 (HB0783)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 /CH0192 (HB0387/CH0191)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB0610)
Title
Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 /CH0047 St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 47
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0097 /CH0596 (SB0261) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 596
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0387 /CH0191 (SB0805/CH0192) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 191
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0610 (SB0995) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0783 (SB0343/CH0326) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1465 (SB0955) Federal Clean Water Act - Authority of State Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1479 /CH0480 Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1653 Washington County - Business Licenses - Zoning Certification Requirement Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0261 (HB0097/CH0596) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0343 /CH0326 (HB0783) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 326
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0805 /CH0192 (HB0387/CH0191) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 192
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0995 (HB0610) Carroll County - Contracts and Purchases Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1061 St. Mary's County - Transfer Tax - Sunset Extension Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:17 PM