Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Councils

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825 (SB0639)
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney and Deputy, Assistant, and Temporary Assistant State's Attorneys - Annual Salary and Compensation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0437
Title
Prince George's County - Board of Education - Elected Member Vacancy - Approval of Appointment PG 422-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411
Title
Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 12-14
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Method for Selection of Members (Listen to the People Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0639 (HB0825)
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary and Compensation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0825 (SB0639) Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney and Deputy, Assistant, and Temporary Assistant State's Attorneys - Annual Salary and Compensation Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1017 /CH0437 Prince George's County - Board of Education - Elected Member Vacancy - Approval of Appointment PG 422-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1092 Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1411 Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 12-14 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1506 /CH0459 Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Method for Selection of Members (Listen to the People Act of 2014) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0639 (HB0825) Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary and Compensation Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1071 Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014 Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM