Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Councils

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0245 (SB0064)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129
Title
Staggered Election Terms - Charter County Councils
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 (SB0166)
Title
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 /CH0261
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 /CH0719 (SB0073)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care Recipients
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415 (SB0419)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0521)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0632
Title
Cecil County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0369 (SB0256/CH0368)
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0731
Title
Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Elections - Voting by County Residents MC 25-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 /CH0299
Title
Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 (HB0009/CH0245)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0368 (HB1017/CH0369)
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0415)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB0764)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752
Title
State Highway Administration - Policy Concerning Sound Barriers Along Highways
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 /CH0245 (SB0064) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0102 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0129 Staggered Election Terms - Charter County Councils Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0243 (SB0166) Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial Review Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 /CH0261 Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0360 /CH0719 (SB0073) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care Recipients Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0415 (SB0419) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0764 (SB0521) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0816 /CH0632 Cecil County - Sheriff - Salary Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1017 /CH0369 (SB0256/CH0368) Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1024 /CH0731 Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1032 Montgomery County Board of Education - Elections - Voting by County Residents MC 25-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1124 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1135 /CH0299 Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 (HB0009/CH0245) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 /CH0368 (HB1017/CH0369) Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners Senator Currie 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 (HB0415) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
SB0521 (HB0764) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 State Highway Administration - Policy Concerning Sound Barriers Along Highways Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM