Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Councils

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 19-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Facility - Local Development Council Membership PG 403-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment PG 508-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative - Repeal PG 511-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232
Title
Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Maglev - Hearing and Approval Requirements PG 402-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894 (SB0750)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 /CH0838
Title
Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1675 (SB1219)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1742
Title
Railroad Companies - Magnetic Levitation (MAGLEV) Projects - County Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1829
Title
Baltimore County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088
Title
Prince George's County - Land Use - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 (HB0894)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 /CH0234 (HB1217/CH0235)
Title
Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1192
Title
Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1219 (HB1675)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 19-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 Prince George's County - Video Lottery Facility - Local Development Council Membership PG 403-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0184 Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment PG 508-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0196 Prince George's County Board of Education - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative - Repeal PG 511-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0232 Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Maglev - Hearing and Approval Requirements PG 402-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0894 (SB0750) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1247 /CH0838 Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1675 (SB1219) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
HB1742 Railroad Companies - Magnetic Levitation (MAGLEV) Projects - County Approval Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1829 Baltimore County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0088 Prince George's County - Land Use - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0750 (HB0894) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0924 /CH0234 (HB1217/CH0235) Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1192 Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1219 (HB1675) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM