Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Councils

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034 /CH0569 (SB0331/CH0570)
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 /CH0167
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 /CH0168
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Housing Opportunities Commission MC 7-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0744
Title
Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 /CH0570 (HB0034/CH0569)
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 /CH0658 (HB0449/CH0657)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1131)
Title
Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 /CH0569 (SB0331/CH0570) Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees Delegate Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Economic Matters
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0304 /CH0167 Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery College MC 12-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 /CH0168 Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Housing Opportunities Commission MC 7-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1409 /CH0744 Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0331 /CH0570 (HB0034/CH0569) Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0451 /CH0658 (HB0449/CH0657) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0758 (HB1131) Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM