Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County Councils

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 (SB0010)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253
Title
Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 504-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 (SB0316)
Title
Frederick County Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0329
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery County Public Schools MC 14-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454 /CH0477
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544
Title
Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1565
Title
Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Governing Bodies and County Executives - Planning and Zoning Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0103)
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 (SB0010) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0253 Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 504-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0410 (SB0316) Frederick County Board of Education - Vacancies Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 /CH0329 Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery County Public Schools MC 14-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 329
Ways and Means
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1362 Harford County - Transfer Tax - Distribution of Proceeds Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1454 /CH0477 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1544 Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1565 Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Governing Bodies and County Executives - Planning and Zoning Applications Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0010 (HB0103) General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:40 PM