Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039
Title
Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Member Qualifications - Criminal Conviction Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Approval of Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 (SB0010)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 8-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 /CH0648
Title
Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107 /CH0147
Title
Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative PG 411-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309
Title
Prince George's County - Education - Consolidated and Coordinated Procurement PG 405-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338 /CH0677
Title
Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 306-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455 /CH0687
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
Anne Arundel County - County Council and County Executive Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0413)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071
Title
Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0039 Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Member Qualifications - Criminal Conviction Prohibition Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0041 Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Approval of Appointments Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0413 (SB0010) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0454 Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 8-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 /CH0648 Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 /CH0147 Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative PG 411-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 Prince George's County - Education - Consolidated and Coordinated Procurement PG 405-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1338 /CH0677 Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 306-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 677
Ways and Means
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 /CH0687 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB1470 Anne Arundel County - County Council and County Executive Special Elections - Voting by Mail Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 (HB0413) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0362 Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation Tax Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB1071 Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative Prince George's County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM