Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0437
Title
Prince George's County - Board of Education - Elected Member Vacancy - Approval of Appointment PG 422-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 /CH0261 (SB1017)
Title
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1017 (HB1415/CH0261)
Title
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0777 Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0994 Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1017 /CH0437 Prince George's County - Board of Education - Elected Member Vacancy - Approval of Appointment PG 422-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1092 Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 03-14 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1415 /CH0261 (SB1017) Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1017 (HB1415/CH0261) Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM