Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Frederick County Public Charter School Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 22-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0232 (SB0503)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0234 (SB0510)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0246
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597 (SB0867)
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710
Title
Prince George's County - School Property - Development of Policy for Noneducational Use PG 406-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734 (SB0406)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973
Title
Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040 (SB0730)
Title
Wicomico County - Board of Education
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0831)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0406 (HB0734)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 (HB0246/CH0232)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0274/CH0234)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1040)
Title
Wicomico County - Board of Education
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education and Nominating Commission - County Executive Appointment Authority
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB1180)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 (HB0597)
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Frederick County Public Charter School Program - Establishment Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
HB0176 Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 22-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0246 /CH0232 (SB0503) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0274 /CH0234 (SB0510) Frederick County - Gaming Events Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0425 /CH0246 Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0597 (SB0867) Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0671 Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 Prince George's County - School Property - Development of Policy for Noneducational Use PG 406-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HB0734 (SB0406) Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0973 Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1040 (SB0730) Wicomico County - Board of Education Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 (SB0831) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Delegation 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0406 (HB0734) Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0503 (HB0246/CH0232) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0510 (HB0274/CH0234) Frederick County - Gaming Events Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB1040) Wicomico County - Board of Education Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Anne Arundel County - Board of Education and Nominating Commission - County Executive Appointment Authority Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 (HB1180) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Senators 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0867 (HB0597) Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM