Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186
Title
Prince George’s County Board of Education – Election of Vice Chair and Voting Procedures PG 507–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Governance PG 509-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 /CH0777
Title
Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0607 (SB0636)
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894 (SB0750)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 /CH0838
Title
Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1675 (SB1219)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 (HB0284/CH0607)
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 (HB0894)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 /CH0234 (HB1217/CH0235)
Title
Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1210
Title
Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1219 (HB1675)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 Prince George’s County Board of Education – Election of Vice Chair and Voting Procedures PG 507–18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0207 Prince George's County Board of Education - Governance PG 509-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0238 /CH0777 Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 /CH0607 (SB0636) Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0894 (SB0750) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1247 /CH0838 Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1675 (SB1219) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
SB0636 (HB0284/CH0607) Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 (HB0894) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Lake Shore Athletic Complex Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0924 /CH0234 (HB1217/CH0235) Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1210 Criminal Procedure - Extradition - Duty of Local Governments (Sanctuary for Citizens Act) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1219 (HB1675) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM