Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 (SB0010)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253
Title
Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 504-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282 /CH0151
Title
Prince George's County - Ethics - Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 407-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 (SB0316)
Title
Frederick County Board of Education - Vacancies
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Selection of Chair MC 1-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544
Title
Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1565
Title
Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Governing Bodies and County Executives - Planning and Zoning Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0103)
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 (SB0010) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0253 Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 504-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0282 /CH0151 Prince George's County - Ethics - Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 407-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 151
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0410 (SB0316) Frederick County Board of Education - Vacancies Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0807 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Selection of Chair MC 1-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1544 Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1565 Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Governing Bodies and County Executives - Planning and Zoning Applications Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0010 (HB0103) General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:21 PM