Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 (SB0160)
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790
Title
State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Judicial Branch Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006
Title
Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0819)
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 (HB0078)
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Opinions - Public Information
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701
Title
Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 (HB1156)
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 (SB0160) Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0618 Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Judicial Branch Employees Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1006 Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor Convictions Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 11:55 (Senator Brochin) Adopted (28-19)
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1156 (SB0819) Maryland Contributory Negligence Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1199 Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0160 (HB0078) Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Opinions - Public Information Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0637 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0701 Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor Convictions Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0819 (HB1156) Maryland Contributory Negligence Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM