Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 (SB0275)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0032)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 (SB0040/CH0008)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0540)
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 (SB0017)
Title
Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0845
Title
Courts Administration - Contracts for Stenography Services - Pro Bono Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0740)
Title
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB0824)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 (HB0542)
Title
Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0108)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0008 (HB0181)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0046)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375
Title
Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 (HB0239)
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 (HB0915)
Title
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1292)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0046 (SB0275) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0108 (SB0032) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 (SB0040/CH0008) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0239 (SB0540) Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0542 (SB0017) Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0563 Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0845 Courts Administration - Contracts for Stenography Services - Pro Bono Requirement Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 (SB0740) Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 (SB0824) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Delegate Jones 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0017 (HB0542) Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0032 (HB0108) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0008 (HB0181) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 (HB0046) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0375 Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor Convictions Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0540 (HB0239) Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0740 (HB0915) Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB1292) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM