Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 (SB0380)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB1021)
Title
Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial Review
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485
Title
Other Tobacco Products - Local Laws for Sale and Distribution - Intent of the General Assembly
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 /CH0379
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0458)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB0645)
Title
Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial Review
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156
Title
Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1159 /CH0026
Title
Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners - Members - Terms and Appointment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0095 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 (SB0380) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 (SB1021) Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial Review Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
HB0757 Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1485 Other Tobacco Products - Local Laws for Sale and Distribution - Intent of the General Assembly Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0157 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0359 /CH0379 Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of Testimony Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 (HB0458) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0592 Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1021 (HB0645) Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial Review Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1156 Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB1159 /CH0026 Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners - Members - Terms and Appointment Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2016 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM