Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0251
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal Rights
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0252)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0444
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 /CH0525 (SB0450/CH0526)
Title
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375 /CH0486 (SB0781/CH0485)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis C
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 (HB0385)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 /CH0544
Title
Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney Representation
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 /CH0485 (HB1375/CH0486)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis C
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1187
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 /CH0251 Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal Rights Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0367 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0385 (SB0252) Redistricting Reform Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 /CH0444 Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 /CH0525 (SB0450/CH0526) Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0881 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1375 /CH0486 (SB0781/CH0485) Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis C Delegate Proctor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0252 (HB0385) Redistricting Reform Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 /CH0544 Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney Representation Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0781 /CH0485 (HB1375/CH0486) Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis C Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1187 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM