Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 (SB0090)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 (SB0091)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0485)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0730
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 (SB0595)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 (HB0043)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0044)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557)
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 (HB1329)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 /CH0770
Title
Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042
Title
Family Law - Removal of Child From United States - Injunction
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 (SB0090) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0044 (SB0091) Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0067 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0487 Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 (SB0485) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1147 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1209 /CH0730 Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1329 (SB0595) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 (HB0043) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0044) Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0246 Circuit Court Judges - Election Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557) Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 (HB1329) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1004 /CH0770 Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1042 Family Law - Removal of Child From United States - Injunction Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM