Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011
Title
Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 (SB0204)
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341 (SB0266)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 (SB0284)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 (SB0758)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 (SB0393)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0596)
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 (SB0593)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0949)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1578 (SB0476)
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 (HB0182)
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0341)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 (HB0346)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0474)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 (HB1578)
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB0624)
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 (HB0518)
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB0401)
Title
Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1231)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0182 (SB0204) Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0341 (SB0266) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0346 (SB0284) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0401 (SB0758) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0458 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0474 (SB0393) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0518 (SB0596) Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0624 (SB0593) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0949) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1578 (SB0476) Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0204 (HB0182) Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 (HB0341) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 (HB0346) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 (HB0474) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0476 (HB1578) Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB0624) Juvenile Law - Child Interrogation Protection Act Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0596 (HB0518) Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0758 (HB0401) Public Information Act - Remote Access, Fee Complaints, Fee Waivers, and Inspection of Judicial Records (Open Government, Better Government Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0949 (HB1231) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 5:49 AM