Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court Costs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024 /CH0758
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0376)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Grace Period for Failure to Appear
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956
Title
Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adult
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB1042)
Title
Access to Maryland Courts Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1383 (SB1212)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403
Title
Motor Vehicles – Failure to Use Seat Belts – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 (HB0456)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB1270)
Title
Access to Maryland Courts Act
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1212 (HB1383)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0024 /CH0758 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - Establishment Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0264 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0376) Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Grace Period for Failure to Appear Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0956 Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adult Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 (SB1042) Access to Maryland Courts Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1383 (SB1212) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018) Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1403 Motor Vehicles – Failure to Use Seat Belts – Penalties Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 (HB0456) Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1042 (HB1270) Access to Maryland Courts Act Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1212 (HB1383) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018) Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM