Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Special Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0363
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Appeals Jurisdiction and Time Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Opinions - Public Information
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0250 /CH0363 Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of Restitution Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB1287 Public-Private Partnerships - Appeals Jurisdiction and Time Requirements Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Opinions - Public Information Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0637 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM