Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 (SB0029)
Title
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 (SB0437)
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0096)
Title
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 (HB0618)
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 (SB0029) State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0618 (SB0437) Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0913 Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 (HB0096) State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0437 (HB0618) Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM