Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0117
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0837)
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1595
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB0915)
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Trotlines and Crab Pots
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0766 /CH0117 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 (SB0837) Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1595 Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0837 (HB0915) Crabs - Harvest Times - Trotlines and Crab Pots Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM