Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in July
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547
Title
Natural Resources - Crabbing Authorizations - Reciprocity
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0061
Title
Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1249 Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in July Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application Requirements Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1547 Natural Resources - Crabbing Authorizations - Reciprocity Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0061 Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM