Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Crabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257
Title
Fishing Gear - Lost and Abandoned Crab Pots - Study
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HJ0003 (SJ0003) Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0257 Fishing Gear - Lost and Abandoned Crab Pots - Study Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0003) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 12:32 PM