Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Credit

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0540)
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 /CH0410
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714 /CH0237 (SB0810)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
Prince George's County - Board of Education - Issuance of Credit Cards - Prohibition PG 415-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 /CH0349 (SB0875/CH0348)
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Recordation Tax - Home Equity Loan Modifications - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Minnick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 (HB0239)
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 (HB0714/CH0237)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0348 (HB1165/CH0349)
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0239 (SB0540) Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 /CH0410 Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0714 /CH0237 (SB0810) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1055 Prince George's County - Board of Education - Issuance of Credit Cards - Prohibition PG 415-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 /CH0349 (SB0875/CH0348) Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 Recordation Tax - Home Equity Loan Modifications - Exemption Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1435 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1467 Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment Delegate Minnick 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0540 (HB0239) Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 (HB0714/CH0237) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0875 /CH0348 (HB1165/CH0349) Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM