Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Credit

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 (SB0549/CH0361)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Name of the Individual
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661 (SB0861)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 (SB0700)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0451
Title
Prince George's County - Board of Education - Issuance of Credit Cards - Prohibition PG 411-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 /CH0361 (HB0529)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Name of the Individual
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0670)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0661)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0915
Title
State Personnel - Selection Test Credits - Eligible Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Providers
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0529 (SB0549/CH0361) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Name of the Individual Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0661 (SB0861) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0670 (SB0700) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0707 /CH0451 Prince George's County - Board of Education - Issuance of Credit Cards - Prohibition PG 411-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0317 Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0549 /CH0361 (HB0529) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Name of the Individual Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB0670) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0661) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0915 State Personnel - Selection Test Credits - Eligible Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Providers Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM